ABHA MAURYA
Abha Maurya is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Abha Maurya is 08579455.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Health and Social Work etc.
Following are the directorship details of Abha Maurya
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJESHWARILIFE HOSPITALS LLP | Health and Social Work | 2019 | Active | Director | 4 October 2019 | 6 October 2019 | Buy financial reports |
RAGHU RAJESHWARI HOSPITAL'S LLP | Health and Social Work | 2019 | Active | Director | 25 October 2019 | 26 October 2019 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Abha Maurya are Nand Lal Verma, Neetu Verma, Prema Devi.
FAQ - Abha Maurya
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Abha Maurya serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Abha Maurya?
The DIN of Abha Maurya is 08579455.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Abha Maurya?
The longest directorship of Abha Maurya is with RAJESHWARILIFE HOSPITALS LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More